8 Jul 2024 to Now
Government Post
Minister of State (Department for Work and Pensions)
4 Jul 2024 to Now
Representative
Birkenhead
4 Dec 2021 to 30 May 2024
Opposition Post
Shadow Minister (Work and Pensions)
9 Nov 2021 to 17 Nov 2021
Committee
Cultural Objects (Protection From Seizure) Bill
10 Apr 2020 to 4 Dec 2021
Opposition Post
Shadow Minister (Digital, Culture, Media and Sport)
2 Mar 2020 to 11 May 2020
Committee
Treasury Committee
12 Dec 2017 to 6 Nov 2019
Committee
Speaker's Advisory Committee on Works of Art
14 Sep 2017 to 6 Nov 2019
Committee
Treasury Sub-Committee
11 Sep 2017 to 6 Nov 2019
Committee
Treasury Committee
26 Oct 2016 to 3 May 2017
Committee
Speaker's Advisory Committee on Works of Art
1 Jul 2015 to 3 May 2017
Committee
Speaker's Advisory Committee on Works of Art
8 May 2015 to 18 Sep 2015
Opposition Post
Shadow Minister (Treasury)
5 Nov 2014 to 30 Mar 2015
Opposition Post
Shadow Minister (Education)
7 Oct 2013 to 5 Nov 2014
Opposition Post
Shadow Minister (International Development)
11 Jan 2013 to 7 Oct 2013
Opposition Post
Opposition Whip (Commons)
18 Nov 2010 to 30 Mar 2015
Committee
Speaker's Advisory Committee on Works of Art
2 Nov 2010 to 4 Feb 2013
Committee
International Development Committee
6 May 2010 to Now
House
Commons
6 May 2010 to Now
Affiliation
Labour
6 May 2010 to 30 May 2024
Representative
Wirral South
Notes
Rows highlighted in green indicates a currently held position.